Ethics commercials ltd
WebInsider Trading Volume Insider Buying: Insufficient data to determine if insiders have bought more shares than they have sold in the past 3 months. Ownership Breakdown Dilution of Shares: Shareholders have not been meaningfully diluted in the past year. Top Shareholders Top 25 shareholders own 66.21% of the company Show more View … WebFeb 15, 2024 · ethics commercials ltd q3 results Latest Breaking News, Pictures, Videos, and Special Reports from The Economic Times. ethics commercials ltd q3 results Blogs, Comments and Archive News on Economictimes.com
Ethics commercials ltd
Did you know?
WebPreeti Shah, director with UNIVERSAL OVERSEAS LTD, is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs (MCA), bearing DIN 00510132. She is an Indian staying in Central Delhi, Delhi, India. Preeti Shah is currently associated with 5 Companies and is director with Eleanora Fashion See More... WebIn addition, P K Textiles Ltd, Ethics Commercials Ltd and Lucky Goldstar Co Ltd ceased to be the subsidiaries of the company. The company is undertaken an expansion project at Anekal in Bangalore for the manufacture of velvet …
WebFeb 15, 2024 · Name of the Company: Scrip Code: De-listed with effect from. ETHICS COMMERCIALS LIMITED. 15096 & 10015096. 16/02/2024. GEMINI OVERSEAS LIMITED. 17130 & 10017130 WebVarun Shah is registered with Ministry of Corporate Affairs (MCA). Their DIN is 03386558. Following is their current and past directorship holdings. Companies Associated With Past Companies Associated With Company Designation Original Date of Appointment Date of Cessation Loginto view this information. Top of page All Companies\ All Directors\
WebETHICS COMMERCIALS LTD Company is incorporated on 12 July 1985, with Registrar of Companies, RoC-Kolkata having CIN - L51502WB1985PLC039193. Visit Company Vakil … WebYou can contact ETHICS COMMERCIALS LTD through their email address which is [email protected]. For any further information, the company ETHICS …
WebPramod Kumar Shah, director with ETHICS COMMERCIALS LTD, is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs (MCA), bearing DIN 00510033. He is an Indian staying in …
WebMundhra Narottam, director with ETHICS COMMERCIALS LTD, is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs (MCA), bearing DIN 03475028. He is an Indian staying in … restaurant in jim thorpe paWebETHICS COMMERCIALS LTD is a Public Non-govt company, which is incorporated in 12-Jul-1985 and the age of this company is 37 Year(s) 8 Month(s) 5 Day(s). Registered … provided plusWebJul 31, 2024 · Ethics Commercials Ltd. is a Public Limited Unlisted company incorporated on 12/07/1985 and has its registered office in the State of West Bengal, India. Company’s … provided port:50000 is not reachable jenkinsWebEthics Commercials Ltd is a 37 years 4 months old Public Company incorporated on 12 Jul 1985. Its registered office is in Kolkata, West Bengal, india. The Company's status is … restaurant in johnson city nyWebETHICS COMMERCIALS LTD, +1 more Calcutta University, Kolkata, +1 more Raghu Kothari Accounts professional at Firestar Diamond Inc Thane. Firestar Diamond Inc Raghu Kothari ... restaurant in john hancock towerWebVARUN SHAH was appointed the director of ETHICS COMMERCIALS LTD on 14-08-2024. You can contact ETHICS COMMERCIALS LTD through their email address which is [email protected]. For any further information, the company ETHICS COMMERCIALS LTD registered address is 19,R.N MUKHERJEE RD KOLKATA Kolkata WB 700001 IN . … provided resource group does not existWebPRAMOD KUMAR SHAH was appointed the director of ETHICS COMMERCIALS LTD on 22-06-2007. You can contact ETHICS COMMERCIALS LTD through their email address which is [email protected]. For any further information, the company ETHICS COMMERCIALS LTD registered address is 19,R.N MUKHERJEE RD KOLKATA Kolkata … provided patient care in a culturally diverse